Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Kelley, Feldman, Astle, Benson, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified carriers to maintain or adhere to specified standards that ensure that enrollees have access to specified health care providers and covered services; specifying the provisions of State insurance law relating to provider panels that apply to managed care organizations; authorizing the Commissioner to designate an insurer or nonprofit health service plan to offer a preferred provider insurance policy that conditions the payment of benefits on the use of preferred providers under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1318
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {817374/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {976186/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {446584/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {817374/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 52
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {976186/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {446584/1 Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-102.3, 19-705.1 )
(   14-205.1, 15-112, 15-112.3, 15-830, 31-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM