Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Smith, Washington, and Carter
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain employees of certain State law enforcement agencies to enforce certain motor vehicle laws within Baltimore City under a certain memorandum of understanding; establishing the P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program to maximize the use of available resources to combat neighborhood decline and support strategies to reduce crime in Baltimore City and the State; requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to submit a certain report to certain committees; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1408
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798177/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {633825/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {973127/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {682112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (128-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {798177/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Floor Amendment {633825/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Floor Amendment {973127/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judiciary 44
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {682112/1 Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (128-0) 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 49B
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-412,   4-1501 through 4-1504 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:57 AM