Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Filing Deadlines for Pre-Primary Election and Post-General Election Campaign Finance Reports
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the deadline date for a campaign finance entity to file a pre-primary election campaign finance report and a post-general election campaign finance report.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664835/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {664835/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 46
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM