Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oysters - Oyster Committees and Harvest Reserve Areas
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to the designation of a harvest reserve area for oysters; repealing specified provisions of law relating to county oyster committees and a statewide committee of oystermen; requiring the licensed oyster harvesters of each tidewater county to elect a county commercial oyster committee; providing for the composition and chair of a county commercial oyster committee; requiring a county commercial oyster committee to establish a specified sustainable oyster harvest plan; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 41
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Referred Senate Rules 41
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1001, 4-1006.2, 4-1009, 4-1009.1, 4-1012, 4-1012.1, 4-1014 through 4-1014.3, 4-1015.1, 4-1019, 4-1019.2, 4-1020, 4-1101, 4-1103, 4-1103.1, 4-1106, 4-1107, 4-1108, 4-1109, 4-11A-05, 4-11A-06, 4-11A-07, 4-11A-08, 4-11A-11, 4-1201, 4-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM