Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of Fee
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Guzzone, and Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene from collecting a fee for issuing a certified or abridged copy of a birth certificate to a homeless individual; requiring the Department to accept as proof of homelessness a signed written statement from a homeless services provider located in the State; requiring that the homeless individual may receive one copy of a birth certificate without a fee in a single transaction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0280
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787976/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {787976/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 63
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM