Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Hershey, Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, Rosapepe, Oaks, and Ready
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission, rather than the Department of Planning, to provide a copy of application materials for a certificate of public convenience and necessity to each appropriate unit of local government in which the construction of a generating station is proposed and to specified public officials; requiring the Commission to take final action on the application only after due consideration of the consistency of the application with the jurisdiction's comprehensive plan and of efforts to resolve specified issues; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1592
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating Stations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {347171/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating Stations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {347171/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM