Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Transportation Oversight as an independent unit in the Executive Branch of State government; applying the motor fuel tax to bunker fuel; requiring the Comptroller and the State Treasurer to establish a certain motor fuel tax rate for diesel fuel and bunker fuel; requiring the Governor to appropriate certain amounts in the annual budget for the operation of the Office and the implementation of the Act; exempting certain actions from certain provisions of the Environmental Standing Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1257
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-504, 1-507 )
(   9-303, 9-305 )
(   28-101 through 28-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM