Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or a corporation to claim a credit against the State income tax for 15% of the cost of a renewable energy system; requiring a renewable energy system for which a credit is claimed to satisfy specified requirements; providing that the amount of the credit may not exceed the State income tax for a taxable year; authorizing an individual or a corporation to apply any excess amount of the credit against the State income tax for succeeding taxable years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1198 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-719 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM