Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Discount Vision Plans - Provider Contracts
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a contract between a discount medical plan organization and a provider of vision care services from limiting or specifying specified fees or requiring the provider to participate in a specified discount vision plan or in a specified provider panel as a condition for participating in another discount vision plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1211
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-601, 14-606, 15-112.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM