Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt certain regulations establishing certain procedures to address cheating and the use of cheating or thieving devices in certain video lottery facilities, parking areas, and adjacent facilities by certain persons or individuals; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations ensuring that certain individuals are charged with criminal trespass; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1025
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM