Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Evidence of Prior Sexual Offense - Admissibility
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, in a prosecution for a specified sexual offense, the court from barring the introduction of specified evidence that the defendant committed a prior sexual offense on the ground that the admission is unfairly prejudicial unless the court makes a specified finding; prohibiting a State's Attorney from introducing specified evidence under specified circumstances; prohibiting specified evidence from being disclosed to a jury or introduced at trial unless the court has held a specified hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Cassilly) Adopted (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Cassilly) Adopted (46-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Referred Senate Rules 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM