Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Peters, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland 529 Board to develop an application form for a certain State contribution program that includes certain information; requiring the Governor to provide appropriations of $5,000,000 in fiscal year 2018 and $3,000,000 in fiscal year 2019 and each fiscal year thereafter; altering the name of the Maryland College Investment Plan and Prepaid College Trust to include a reference to Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer; altering the date by which the Board is required to develop and implement an outreach and marketing plan; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1341
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland College Investment Plan - State Match Requirement - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {779135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654069/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland College Investment Plan - State Match Requirement - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {779135/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {654069/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Text - Chapter - College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
(   18-1901, 18-1902.1, 18-1903, 18-1904, 18-1909, 18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-03, 18-19A-04.1, 18-19A-05, 18-19A-06, 18-19B-05, 18-19C-05 )
(   10-740 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page