Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending specified prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that specified grantees provide specified matching funds; extending the deadline for specified grantees to present evidence that a matching fund will be presented; providing that specified grants may not terminate before specified dates; changing the locations of specified capital projects; altering the purpose of specified grants; changing the names of specified grantees; making a technical correction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1372
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM