Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal Object
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and McFadden
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 9:45 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified records that a secondhand precious metal object dealer or pawnbroker is required to keep for specified purposes to include a photograph of each precious metal object acquired or pawned.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534135/1
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534135/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {983423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 9:45 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {534135/1 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {534135/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {983423/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Hearing 4/11 at 9:45 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-301, 12-302, 12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM