Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court to entertain a specified action against a local government or its employee even though a specified notice was not given, under specified circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0637
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288577/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288577/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-1)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {288577/1 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Laid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {288577/1 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-1) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM