Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Natural Resources Police - Transfer of Duties and Responsibilities to the Department of State Police
Sponsored by
Senator Dyson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Abolishing the Department of Natural Resources Police Force; transferring the duties and responsibilities of the Department of Natural Resources Police Force to the Department of State Police; specifying that the Department of State Police is responsible for the enforcement of the natural resources laws of the State; providing for the transfer of specified employees, functions, property, equipment, records, assets, and liabilities of the Natural Resources police to the Department of State Police; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-101, 5-212 )
(   10-1103, 10-1104, 10-1105, 10-1106, 10-2A-07, 10-301.3, 10-306, 10-312, 10-413, 10-415, 10-416, 10-417, 10-422, 10-425, 10-506, 10-508, 10-512, 10-906, 1-104, 1-107, 1-201 through 1-210, 1-2A-01, 2-405, 4-1012, 4-1018, 4-1039, 4-11A-03.2, 4-1203 through 4-1206, 4-211, 4-220, 4-2A-07, 4-506.1, 4-610, 4-613, 4-701, 4-713, 4-742, 5-206, 8-709, 8-712.2, 8-726.1, 8-727 )
(   26-201, 8-308, 8-309 )
(   16-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM