Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Delegation of Health Care Decisions - Temporary Health Care Agent for Minors
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the parent or legal guardian of a minor to delegate to a temporary health care agent the authority to consent to and make decisions regarding medically necessary health care treatment of the minor; requiring a specified delegation to be made on a specified medical authorization treatment form; prohibiting a parent or legal guardian from delegating to a temporary health care agent the power to make specified decisions regarding life-sustaining treatment of the minor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0961
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Delegation of Health Care Decisions - Temporary Health Care Agent for Minors
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1801, 20-1802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM