Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending a specified credit against the State income tax for electricity-producing facilities using specified qualified energy resources and placed in service on or after January 1, 2006, but before January 1, 2019; extending the period in which the Maryland Energy Administration may issue specified qualifying certifications to December 31, 2018; establishing the Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Tax Credit Reserve Fund; authorizing the Governor to include an appropriation to the Reserve Fund for fiscal years 2018-2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1145
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589432/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589432/1
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589432/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305365/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-42)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {589432/1 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments {589432/1 48A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments {589432/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {305365/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-42) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-720 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM