Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting Rights
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt regulations establishing a program to inform certain eligible detainees in correctional facilities of upcoming elections and how the eligible detainees may exercise the right to vote; requiring that the regulations provide for the dissemination of certain information and applications and certain transmission of certain applications and ballots between correctional facilities and the local boards of elections; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0252
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting Rights
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM