Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Administration - Duties of State Administrator, Local Boards of Elections, and Election Directors and Cybersecurity Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Ellis, and Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Administrator of Elections to exercise disciplinary authority over the local election directors for non-compliance with State rules, regulations, and policies; requiring a local board of elections to notify the State Administrator in writing within 24 hours after becoming aware of a certain security violation or a certain significant attempted security violation involving an election system; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Administration - Duties of State Administrator, Local Boards of Elections, and Election Directors and Cybersecurity Requirements
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/6/2020 1:04 PM