Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Powdered Alcoholic Beverages - Ban on Sales
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Raskin, Kasemeyer, and Miller
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell alcoholic beverages that are sold in a powder or crystalline form for direct use or use in combination with water or any other substance; providing for a penalty of up to $1,000 for a violation of the Act; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {833995/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (112-26)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-23)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {833995/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (112-26) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (116-23) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-102, 16-505.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM