Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Oyster Population and Fishery Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Astle, Bates, Klausmeier, Raskin, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in consultation with the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science to conduct a specified study related to the public oyster fishery; requiring the Department to identify oyster management strategies to promote a sustainable oyster population and fishery; requiring the Department to submit specified reports on the study and specified oyster management strategies to the Governor, the Oyster Advisory Commission, and the General Assembly on or before specified dates; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1603
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274031/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274031/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {463024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {253525/1 Rejected
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Salling) Rejected (14-30)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {350412/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-4)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {274031/1 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {274031/1 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {463024/1 Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {253525/1 Rejected 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Salling) Rejected (14-30) 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 50
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {350412/1 Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-4) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM