Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Sponsored by
Senators Smith and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making it a civil rather than a criminal offense to consume an alcoholic beverage in public under specified circumstances or to possess an alcoholic beverage in an open container under specified circumstances; requiring offenders to be issued a citation under specified circumstances; and providing a maximum fine of $100.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0380
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {508979/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters Judiciary
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {508979/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Economic Matters Judiciary 39
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-321, 6-322 )
(   10-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM