Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wireless Facilities - Installation and Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing procedures and requirements for the deployment, installation, and regulation of certain wireless telecommunications facilities in the State; prohibiting an authority from entering into an exclusive agreement for the use of certain rights-of-way for certain purposes; authorizing an authority to impose certain rates and fees for use of certain rights-of-way in a certain manner and subject to certain limitations; authorizing a wireless provider to collocate certain facilities and use certain rights-of-way; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0654
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wireless Facilities - Installation and Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred to interim study by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Wireless Facilities - Installation and Regulation
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Referred to interim study by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 13-201, 8-701 through 8-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM