Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Public Service Commission from taking final action on an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity for the construction of a specified land-based wind generating station that will be wholly or partly located in Kent County until the County Commissioners of Kent County have approved the construction of the generating station.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Hershey) Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Hershey) Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM