Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting by Mail (Universal Vote by Mail Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Ferguson, Lee, and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a voter to cast a ballot by mail; requiring the State Board of Elections, in consultation with the local boards of elections, to select a certain voting system; requiring the local boards to mail a ballot for voting by mail to specified voters by specified deadlines; requiring a voter who receives a ballot for voting by mail to take specific action to vote the ballot; providing the methods by which a voter may return a ballot for voting by mail; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101 through 10-301, 10-301.1, 10-302 through 10-315, 1-101, 11-101, 11-202, 11-303, 11-307, 11-403, 13-245, 16-201, 16-203, 16-205, 16-206, 16-207, 16-303, 16-304, 16-801 through 16-804, 2-106, 2-107, 2-202, 2-203, 2-206, 2-303, 3-304, 3-305, 5-303, 7-105, 8-102, 9-101 through 9-105, 9-101 through 9-107, 9-204, 9-205, 9-213, 9-216, 9-305, 9-401 through 9-408, 9-501 through 9-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM