Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Sentencing Guidelines – Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that criminal sentencing guidelines adopted by the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy set forth a range of increased severity for defendants who have been previously adjudicated delinquent.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Sentencing Guidelines – Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM