Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding Recommendations of Fact Finder
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the written recommendations of a fact finder are binding in a collective bargaining dispute between the Maryland Transportation Authority and the exclusive representative of the full-time Maryland Transportation Authority police officers at the rank of first sergeant and below.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1298
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding Recommendations of Fact Finder
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM