Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Leave of Absence - Extension of Purchase Period
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Executive Director of the State Retirement Agency, under specified circumstances, to extend the period of time during which specified members of the State Retirement and Pension System who are separated from employment may purchase service credit for a specified leave of absence; requiring a specified purchase of service credit to be made within a specified time period; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {219234/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {219234/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-304.1, 24-304.1, 25-304.1, 26-306.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM