Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain home- and community-based services waiver include a requirement that at least half the waiver participants live in community-based housing immediately before receiving waiver services; requiring that a certain waiver required by the Maryland Department of Health implement a certain waiting list; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide individuals on the waiting list with certain information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1618
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1001, 7-132 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM