Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a personal representative to request specified compensation, restitution, or financial property interest for a decedent who was a victim of a crime; providing that the rights, duties, and powers of a guardian of the person of a minor shall include serving as a victim's representative under specified circumstances; authorizing a court to order a guardian of the person of a specified person with a disability to serve as a victim's representative under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0705
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-213, 13-702, 13-708, 15-102, 7-401 )
(   14-202, 5-532 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM