Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Relocation
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception to a specified statement of need requirement for the relocation of an existing licensed residential child care program if the relocation is necessary due to circumstances beyond the control of the licensee, including the nonrenewal of the lease for the site of the existing licensed residential child care program, the new site meets the requirements of the residential child care program's license, and the new site is located within the same jurisdiction and within 10 miles of the closed site.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844430/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {844430/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-703.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM