Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for specified time periods; increasing, except under specified circumstances, the State minimum wage rate in effect for specified periods of time based on the annual growth in the Consumer Price Index; repealing the authority of an employer to include, as part of an employee's wage, a specified amount to represent the tips of the employee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1372
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-413, 3-419 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM