Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses Authorized
Sponsored by
Senator Dyson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, subject to specified requirements, a person to place or maintain an advertising sign for specified agricultural businesses on a State highway; providing that specified provisions of law regulating the placement and maintenance of outdoor signs in specified locations do not apply to a sign placed in accordance with the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0326 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
(   8-605, 8-714 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM