Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Victims and Witnesses – Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certain person may withhold the address or telephone number of a certain victim, victim's representative, or witness before a certain trial or adjudicatory hearing.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1314
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Victims and Witnesses – Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM