Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Peters, Rosapepe, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exception for a specified person from the prohibition against carrying or transporting a specified firearm under specified circumstances; requiring a court to inform a person convicted of a specified offense that the person is prohibited from possessing a firearm; requiring the court to advise the person that specified proof must be provided to the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services that specified firearms in the person's possession have been transferred from the person's possession; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1001
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0530 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748472/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {952710/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (88-49)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Raskin, Lee, and Ready
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Smith
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {748472/2 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 54
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {952710/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (88-49) 66A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Raskin, Lee, and Ready 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 House Refuses to Recede 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Smith 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-233, 6-234 )
(   4-203, 4-302 )
(   5-133, 5-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM