Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Controlled Dangerous Substance Use During Pregnancy and Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the discharge of a substance-exposed newborn from a hospital or birthing center until specified requirements are completed; requiring a local department of social services to conduct a specified investigation when it determines a newborn is substance-exposed; requiring a health care practitioner who discovers that a person has used a specified controlled dangerous substance while pregnant to make specified reports; authorizing the use of a specified report as evidence for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-704.2, 5-704.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM