Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Classification
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reclassifying criminal conduct currently classified as sexual offense in the first degree and sexual offense in the second degree as rape in the first degree and rape in the second degree, respectively; and repealing the crimes of sexual offense in the first degree, sexual offense in the second degree, attempted sexual offense in the first degree, and attempted sexual offense in the second degree.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0647
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Classification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Classification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Classification
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Classification
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Classification
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 48
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Classification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-502, 3-702, 9-201 )
(   11-304, 11-701, 11-704, 11-704.1, 11-723, 11-922, 6-220, 6-222 )
(   3-303, 3-304, 3-305, 3-306, 3-308, 3-311, 3-312, 3-313, 3-314, 3-315 through 3-317, 3-320 )
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM