Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital to provide certain instructions to the parent or legal guardian of an infant before the hospital discharges the infant into the care of the parent or legal guardian; requiring a hospital before discharging an infant to inquire as to whether a parent or legal guardian is able to provide the infant with a certain environment and a certain item, inform a parent or legal guardian of certain matters, and provide each parent or legal guardian with a certain form; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0989
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-308.9 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page