Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Governing Board and Data Transfers
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding the President of the Maryland Independent College and University Association, or the President's designee, to the Governing Board of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center; requiring private nonprofit institutions of higher education that receive State funds to transfer specified student data to the Maryland Longitudinal Data System in accordance with a specified plan; establishing that a specified institution that transfers specified data to the system is not liable for a specified breach of confidentiality; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations 51
House 3/21/2013 3/21/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 62
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-6) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-701, 24-704, 24-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM