Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Brochin, Feldman, Guzzone, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Ramirez, Ready, Rosapepe, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require a person who is convicted of specified offenses relating to driving under the influence of alcohol to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for specified periods of time; increasing the suspension periods for the driver's license of a person who has refused or has specified results after a test for breath alcohol concentration; requiring a person whose license is suspended after specified results from a specified test to participate in the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1342
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468078/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {952311/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, and Proctor
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {468078/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {952311/2 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-2) 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Refuses to Recede 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Delegates Dumais, Anderson, and Proctor 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 72
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-205, 16-205.1, 16-404.1, 27-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM