Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Store Cameras
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain alcoholic beverages license holders in Baltimore City to install and operate a digital surveillance system on the licensed premises in accordance with regulations adopted by the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City; requiring the digital surveillance system to be equipped with high-definition cameras; requiring the cameras to be placed in certain places; requiring the video recorded from the surveillance system to be retained for at least 14 days; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Store Cameras
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Store Cameras
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   12-102, 12-901, 12-902 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page