Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report
Sponsored by
Senators Gladden, Hough, Ferguson, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Raskin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services on or before December 31 of each year to submit specified data to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the General Assembly relating to the use of restrictive housing in correctional facilities; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to make the information submitted available on its Web site.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1180
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {958976/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {162414/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-39)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {958976/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judiciary 50
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {162414/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-39) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM