Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission to plan and conduct observances commemorating the 400th year of Maryland's founding in 2034; requiring the membership of the Commission to reflect the diversity of the State to the extent practical; requiring the Commission to meet at least twice a year; requiring the Commission to provide an update to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2022 and each year thereafter on the plan of action for the commemoration; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1364
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2021 2/14/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   9-3301 through 9-3307 )
Last Updated: 3/2/2021 6:28 PM
Click to return on the top page