Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Shank
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to use a specified process to remediate blighted property; requiring the owner of a blighted property, on notification from the appropriate unit of local government, to remediate the property's blighted condition in a specified manner; requiring the appropriate unit of local government to send a specified notice to specified lienholders; authorizing the appropriate unit of local government to grant an extension of the required time periods; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0028 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-120.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM