Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified retail service stations constructed after a specified date to meet specified requirements; requiring a person constructing a specified retail service station on or after a specified date to apply to the Department of the Environment for a setback certification; requiring the Department to issue a setback certification if a specified retail service station meets specified requirements; requiring the Department to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0835
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101 through 6-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM