Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a nonpublic elementary or secondary school that receives State funds from refusing to enroll, expelling, withholding privileges from, or otherwise discriminating against any student or prospective student because of specified factors; making specified provisions of law prohibiting discrimination in employment applicable to nonpublic elementary and secondary schools that receive State funds; making specified remedies and procedures regarding discrimination applicable to specified discriminatory acts; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/10/2016 3/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1001, 20-1006, 20-1007, 20-1009, 20-101, 20-1012, 20-1013, 20-1017, 20-604, 20-7A-01, 20-7A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM