Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a holder of a seven-day Class B beer, wine and liquor license in Worcester County to sell beer, wine and liquor off-sale; creating a Class EF (entertainment facility) beer, wine, and liquor license; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor from one or more outlets in a specified entertainment facility for consumption anywhere throughout the entertainment facility only; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894939/1
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894939/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894939/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894939/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Mathias) {173821/4 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953593/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {894939/1 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 51
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {894939/1 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Conway) Adopted 53
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments {894939/1 54
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Conway) Adopted 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {894939/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Mathias) {173821/4 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {953593/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-304, 13-101, 15-204, 15-205, 6-201, 6-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM