Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Sponsored by
Senators Smith and Madaleno
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement at a specified time if the person was convicted of possession of marijuana.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0379
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana and Fees
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {208977/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Judiciary 46
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {632419/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (94-43) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 59
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Refuses Recede 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, J. Lewis and Rey) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, J. Lewis and Rey) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Muse and Ready) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Muse and Ready) 67
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Conference Committee Report {163720/1 Adopted 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 69
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Conference Committee Report {163720/1 Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-110 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:56 PM