Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Education Policy Act
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Benson, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Peters, Ramirez, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public high schools to make students aware of certain employment and skills training opportunities through certain apprenticeship sponsors and employers; specifying that a requirement to earn a credit in technology education to graduate may be satisfied by completing certain courses selected by the county board; authorizing certain applicants for legislative scholarships to be enrolled in Workforce Development Sequence courses or be participating in an apprenticeship training program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1599
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Education Policy Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Career Education Policy Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1, 18-101, 18-401, 18-402, 18-405, 18-406, 18-501, 18-504, 18-506, 21-204, 4-134, 4-135, 7-203.1, 7-205.4, 7-211, 9-113 )
(   11-405, 11-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM